Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Department of Veterans Affairs - Veterans' Services Specialists
Sponsored by
Senators Smith and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 707
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring units of State government to designate an employee of the unit as a veterans' services specialist to coordinate services with the director of the veterans Outreach and Advocacy Program in the Department of Veterans Affairs and attend specified training, to provide the Department of Veterans Affairs with specified information, and to post specified information on the unit's Web site; requiring the Department to coordinate specified meetings and submit a specified report; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1275
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Waugh) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {523627/1 (Senator Waugh)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {523627/1 (Senator Waugh) Withdrawn
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {796886/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 707
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Government - Department of Veterans Affairs - Veterans' Services Specialists
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Waugh) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Floor Amendment {523627/1 (Senator Waugh) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Conway) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Amendment {523627/1 (Senator Waugh) Withdrawn 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Department of Veterans Affairs - Veterans' Services Specialists
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {796886/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Government - Department of Veterans Affairs - Veterans' Services Specialists
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 707
Text - Chapter - State Government - Department of Veterans Affairs - Veterans' Services Specialists
(   9-943, 9-944 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page