Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance – Access to Local Health Departments
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a carrier that is an insurer, a nonprofit health service plan, or a health maintenance organization, except for a group model health maintenance organization, to ensure in certain standards that certain enrollees have access to local health departments and certain services provided through local health departments to the extent that local health departments are willing to participate on a carrier's provider panel; applying the Act to all policies and contracts issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1132
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance – Access to Local Health Departments
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {107774/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance – Access to Local Health Departments
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance – Access to Local Health Departments
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Insurance – Access to Local Health Departments
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {107774/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance – Access to Local Health Departments
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance – Access to Local Health Departments
(   15-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page