Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Academic Research - Medical Uses and Properties of Cannabis
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an institution of higher education, a related medical facility, or an affiliated biomedical research firm to file with the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission a registration to purchase medical cannabis for the purpose of conducting a bona fide research project relating to the medical uses, properties, or composition of cannabis; providing that a certain registration is valid until the Commission receives certain notification; authorizing the Commission to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0881
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {868176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Academic Research - Medical Uses and Properties of Cannabis
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {868176/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Academic Research - Medical Uses and Properties of Cannabis
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-3301, 13-3304.1, 13-3306, 13-3307, 13-3309, 13-3313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page