Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Advertisements
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that certain advertisements for medical cannabis, medical cannabis products, or medical cannabis-related services be supported by substantial clinical evidence or data and include information about side effects or risks associated with the use of cannabis; prohibiting advertisements from being false or misleading or from containing certain designs, pictures, illustrations or representations; requiring any website owned, managed, or operated by certain providers to employ a neutral age-screening mechanism; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Advertisements
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {388672/1
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {388672/1
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {388672/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {903826/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Advertisements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Advertisements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {388672/1 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Smith) Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {388672/1 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator West) Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {388672/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Floor Amendment {903826/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Advertisements
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 58 Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-3313.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page