Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Firearm Industry Members – Public Nuisance
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certain firearm industry member from knowingly or recklessly engaging in conduct that is unlawful or unreasonable in the State and that endangers the safety or health of the public; requiring a firearm industry member to establish and use certain reasonable controls and procedures to prevent a certain product from being possessed, used, marketed, or sold unlawfully in the State; establishing that a violation of the Act is a public nuisance; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1396
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety – Firearm Industry Members – Public Nuisance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety – Firearm Industry Members – Public Nuisance
Senate 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Hearing canceled
(   5-701 through 5-704 )
Last Updated: 3/4/2022 3:38 PM
Click to return on the top page