Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Operating Budget - Education Programs - Mandated Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 400
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2023 an appropriation to each program under Funding for Educational Organizations equal to the greater of the funding the program received in fiscal year 2020, 2021 or 2022 and an additional $150,000.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1053
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Operating Budget - Education Programs - Mandated Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {449132/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Operating Budget - Education Programs - Mandated Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-24)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 400
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Operating Budget - Education Programs - Mandated Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Operating Budget - Education Programs - Mandated Funding
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {449132/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Operating Budget - Education Programs - Mandated Funding
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Appropriations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (113-24) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 400
Text - Chapter - Operating Budget - Education Programs - Mandated Funding
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:09 PM
Click to return on the top page