Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Work and Community Engagement Requirements - Waiver
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, on or before October 1, 2018, to apply to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a waiver under a certain provision of federal law to implement a certain demonstration project establishing work or community engagement requirements on certain enrollees in the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; requiring a certain application to include certain information; and requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1477
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Work and Community Engagement Requirements - Waiver
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page