Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County Board of Education - Expenditure Report Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza and Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Wicomico County Board of Education to submit a certain expenditure report to the Wicomico County Council on or before November 1 and March 1 of each fiscal year.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Wicomico County Board of Education - Expenditure Report Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Wicomico County Board of Education - Expenditure Report Requirements
Senate 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 3/3/2022 10:43 AM
Click to return on the top page