Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Release of Information - Criminal Activity
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commission on Judicial Disabilities to provide information on a judge's criminal activity to applicable law enforcement and prosecuting officials, including a grand jury if the information is requested by subpoena.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commission on Judicial Disabilities - Release of Information - Criminal Activity
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 3/15/2022 1:48 PM
Click to return on the top page