Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Independent Investigative Unit in the Office of the Attorney General to be the Independent Investigations Division; authorizing the Attorney General or certain designated individuals to seek certain injunctive relief or issue a certain subpoena under certain circumstances; authorizing the Division or a certain State's Attorney to prosecute a police officer under certain circumstances; requiring the Governor to include an appropriation of $5,000,000 for the Division in fiscal year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {123822/1
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {123822/1
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (28-18)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (25-21)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Independent Investigations - Revisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {123822/1 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments {123822/1 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Committee Amendment Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (28-18) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (25-21) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Judiciary
(   6-106.2,   6-601, 6-603 through 6-605 )
Last Updated: 5/3/2022 1:35 PM
Click to return on the top page