Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Domestic Violence Survivor Resilience Loan Program and Guarantee Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a financial institution to establish a process to classify a loan issued to a participant in the Domestic Violence Survivor Resilience Loan Program as a domestic violence survivor resilience loan; establishing the Domestic Violence Survivor Resilience Loan Program within the Office of the Secretary of State to establish eligibility for a domestic violence survivor resilience loan and provide loan guarantees; establishing the Domestic Violence Survivor Resilience Loan Guarantee Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Domestic Violence Survivor Resilience Loan Program and Guarantee Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Domestic Violence Survivor Resilience Loan Program and Guarantee Fund
Senate 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   1-501 through 1-504 )
(   7-401 through 7-410 )
Last Updated: 3/10/2022 12:03 PM
Click to return on the top page