Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Medical Examinations on Anesthetized or Unconscious Patients
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting health care practitioners and certain students and trainees from performing certain examinations on a patient who is under anesthesia or unconscious unless informed consent has been obtained from the patient, the examination is within the standard of care, the patient is unconscious and the examination is required for diagnostic or treatment purposes, or an emergency exists, it is impractical to obtain the patient's consent, and the examination is required for diagnostic or treatment purposes; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0364
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {774539/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {216788/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Health Care Practitioners - Medical Examinations on Anesthetized or Unconscious Patients
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {774539/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Care Practitioners - Medical Examinations on Anesthetized or Unconscious Patients
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {216788/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Care Practitioners - Medical Examinations on Anesthetized or Unconscious Patients
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Text - Chapter - Health Care Practitioners - Medical Examinations on Anesthetized or Unconscious Patients
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page