Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain fees charged by the State Department of Assessments and Taxation for processing articles of dissolution, certificates of cancellation, and certain other documents filed by certain business entities with the Department.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0647
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal
Senate 3/23/2021 3/24/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page