Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the purposes for which certain county transportation bonds may be issued to include providing local participating funds for State-aided transportation projects and to provide for certain local capital improvement projects; altering the amount of revenue credited to the Gasoline and Motor Vehicle Revenue Account that may be used for certain purposes; altering the percentage of highway user revenues required to be distributed to Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2022 2/13/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution
Senate 2/28/2022 3/01/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/17/2022 12:48 PM
Click to return on the top page