Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring law enforcement agencies to develop and implement certain recruitment policies; expanding the Edward T. Conroy and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program and the Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Program to include certain postsecondary institutions outside the State as eligible institutions that may award scholarships under the programs; and establishing the Police Officers Educational Benefit Scholarship I and the Police Officers Educational Benefit Scholarship II.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713926/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {743822/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2022 2/13/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Police Officers - Education Requirements - Certification and Scholarships
Senate 2/28/2022 3/01/2022 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {713926/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Floor Committee Amendment {743822/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Age
(   18-101,   18-103,   18-3901 through 18-3904, 18-601   )
Last Updated: 5/3/2022 1:35 PM
Click to return on the top page