Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $350,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of The Young Women's Christian Association of Annapolis and Anne Arundel County, Inc. for specified development or improvement purposes related to The YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House, located in Anne Arundel County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0986
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page