Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Use of Minority and Women-Owned Business Enterprises (Diversity Among Asset Managers Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Investment Committee of the State Retirement Agency to assess the use of minority business enterprises beginning July 1, 2022, and each fiscal year thereafter; requiring a certain certification agency and the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs, in consutation with certain entities, to initiate a certain study to evaluate whether remedial measures are needed to comply with a certain court opinion and any subsequent federal or constitutional requirements; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0542
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553528/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Committee - Use of Minority Business Enterprises (Diversity Among Asset Managers Act of 2022)
Senate 2/28/2022 3/01/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {553528/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Use of Minority and Women-Owned Business Enterprises (Diversity Among Asset Managers Act of 2022)
Senate 3/22/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/17/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Hearing canceled
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/18/2022 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page