Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing Offenses - Expungement
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of certain criminal records based on a conviction for certain hunting or fishing offenses; and authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of certain administrative records for a conviction based on certain hunting offenses.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1298
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing Offenses - Expungement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing Offenses - Expungement
Senate 3/09/2022 3/10/2022 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/18/2022 3:14 PM
Click to return on the top page