Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the owner of a rental vehicle may satisfy a specified insurance requirement by maintaining a specified security that is secondary to any other valid and collectible coverage; requiring a motor vehicle rental company to disclose specified information about a person that rents or is authorized to drive a rental vehicle to a specified person under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1385
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
21AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Reassigned to Finance 21AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
(   17-103, 17-104, 17-104.3, 18-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page