Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales - Final Judgments in Foreclosure Actions - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court, under certain circumstances, to strike the final judgment in a tax sale action foreclosing the right of redemption in a property and grant the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation the right to pay the balance of the purchase price due on the property; applying the Act retroactively; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Sales - Final Judgments in Foreclosure Actions - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Tax Sales - Final Judgments in Foreclosure Actions - Revisions
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/18/2022 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page