Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Concentration of Poverty School Grant Program – School Lunch
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an eligible school that receives a per pupil grant under the Concentration of Poverty Grant Program to provide free school lunch to each student at the eligible school under certain circumstances; prohibiting a county board of education from charging students for school lunch at an eligible school; and requiring certain funding to be provided in the State budget to provide certain students with free school lunch.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0857
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Education – Concentration of Poverty School Grant Program – School Lunch
Senate 2/28/2022 3/01/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Last Updated: 3/17/2022 2:04 PM
Click to return on the top page