Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Repeal of Solar Energy Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Pipkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that an electricity supplier's renewable energy portfolio include a specified percent of solar energy in specified years; repealing specified compliance fees for a shortfall from solar energy requirements under the renewable energy portfolio standard; altering the responsibilities of a specified individual designated by the Public Service Commission; and repealing a requirement that specified compliance fees be accounted for and used in a specified manner.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-703, 7-705, 7-709, 7-711 )
(   9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page