Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – State Designated Exchange – Health Data Utility
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State designated exchange to operate as a health data utility for the collection and analysis of health information and data to assist in the evaluation of public health interventions and health equity; requiring the Maryland Department of Health, dispensers, certain nursing homes, and electronic health networks to provide certain medication data to the State designated exchange; and requiring dispensers to submit prescription information to the exchange for purposes of patient treatment and care coordination.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1127
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health – State Designated Exchange – Health Data Utility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2022 2/18/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Health – State Designated Exchange – Health Data Utility
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/22/2022 5:46 PM
Click to return on the top page