Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the graduate social worker license issued by the State Board of Social Work Examiners to be the master social worker license; requiring a specified licensed bachelor social worker or licensed master social worker to submit specified information to the Board to obtain approval by the Board to engage in independent practice; authorizing the Board to reject an application for independent practice if the applicant has not completed the specified supervised experience required; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1183
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {794735/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {276088/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable with Amendments {794735/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {276088/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Text - Chapter - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
(   19-101, 19-202, 19-302, 19-302.2, 19-306 through 19-309, 19-316.1, 19-318, 19-402, 19-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page