Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt (By Request - Dorchester County Council)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $4,700 to $6,000, the salary of a judge of the Orphans' Court for Dorchester County; and increasing, from $800 to $1,000, the annual expense allowance of a judge of the Orphans' Court for Dorchester County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1456
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2022 2/19/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges
Senate 3/29/2022 3/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Judiciary
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Text - Chapter - Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:39 PM
Click to return on the top page