Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Predictable Scheduling Act
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing certain requirements on food service establishments, hospitality establishments, and retail establishments regarding work schedules for employees, including requirements related to the provision of work schedules to employees, notifications regarding changes to the schedules, and payment of wages to employees whose work schedules are changed by the employer; authorizing certain employees to request an adjustment in a work schedule before beginning a shift; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1226
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Predictable Scheduling Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Predictable Scheduling Act
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2024 2/17/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2024 2/17/2024 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page