Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - REAL School Gardens Pilot Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Guzzone, King, Madaleno, Muse, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the REAL School Gardens Pilot Program to design and build custom outdoor classrooms at certain public elementary schools and to train teachers to use outdoor classrooms; requiring certain jurisdictions to implement the Program; requiring the Governor's proposed budget for fiscal year 2020 to appropriate $200,000 to the Department to be used only for the Program; requiring the Department to obtain the services of an independent third party to conduct a certain review on or before June 30, 2020; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564537/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Department of Education - REAL School Gardens Pilot Program - Established
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {564537/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Department of Education - REAL School Gardens Pilot Program - Established
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-125 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page