Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Lee, and Ready
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that specified provisions of State law governing performance standards for vehicle dealers apply to vehicle manufacturers notwithstanding specified other agreements; requiring that the assignment of a dealer's market area meet specified standards; and requiring vehicle manufacturers to consider specified factors in assigning a market area and applying performance standards, sales objectives, or programs for measuring dealer performance.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1120
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {138774/1
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {138774/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {133129/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {753322/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {138774/1 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Miller) Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {138774/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {133129/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {753322/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 69 Click to view Recorded Media
(   15-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page