Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring an insurer that issues or delivers in the State a policy of motor vehicle liability insurance that provides coverage for the repair of physical damage to the insured motor vehicle to authorize specified repairs to be made using original equipment manufacturer's replacement crash parts or certified aftermarket crash parts; authorizing an insured to consent in a specified manner to the use of aftermarket crash parts; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   27-908 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page