Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin and Miller
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain definition of "serious offense" to remove a certain limitation on offenses that are included for purposes relating to representation by the Office of the Public Defender.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
Senate 3/08/2019 3/11/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57 Click to view Recorded Media
(   16-101, 16-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page