Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Chestertown Rural Health Care Delivery Innovations Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Chestertown Rural Health Care Delivery Innovations Pilot Program in the Maryland Department of Health to promote innovative solutions for a sustainable future for inpatient care in rural areas, satisfy requirements for hospital-based care, and ensure improvements to community health; requiring the Department to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the activities and findings from the initial 5 years of the Pilot Program and certain recommendations based on those findings; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {347775/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Health Facilities - Chestertown Rural Health Care Delivery Innovations Pilot Program
Senate 3/05/2019 3/06/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {347775/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Facilities - Chestertown Rural Health Care Delivery Innovations Pilot Program
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page