Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Zirkin, Kelley, Brochin, Cassilly, Hough, Lee, Muse, Ramirez, Ready, Zucker, Peters, Feldman, Madaleno, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Rosapepe, Benson, Currie, and Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a State's Attorney to serve a certain written notice on a defendant, the defendant's counsel, and the court prior to trial or the acceptance of a plea of guilty or the equivalent; requiring a court to inform, both verbally and in a written notice, a defendant convicted of a domestically related offense that the defendant is prohibited from possessing certain firearms; requiring the defendant to transfer all regulated firearms within 2 business days to a State or local law enforcement agency or federally licensed dealer; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1646
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {108076/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {633725/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {112119/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-6)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Ready and Muse)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {108076/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Floor Amendment {633725/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Referred Judiciary 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {112119/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-6) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Ready and Muse) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
(   4-303 )
(   5-133, 5-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page