Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the privileges of Class B beer, wine, and liquor hotel and restaurant licenses issued in Washington County so that the privileges may be exercised for on- and off-premises consumption for licenses that had on- and off-sale privileges on or before June 30, 2016, and for on-premises consumption only for all other licenses; and requiring the license holder to notify the Board before constructing or altering an area on the premises where beer, wine, and liquor are sold.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1450
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253694/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Referred Economic Matters 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {253694/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
(   31-102, 31-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page