Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Motor Vehicle Repair and Career Certification Program for Ex-Offenders
Sponsored by
Senators Carter and Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Motor Vehicle Repair and Career Certification Program for Ex-Offenders in the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning to provide apprenticeships to ex-offenders in motor vehicle repair and service; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to administer the Program and provide grants on a competitive basis to employers who are located in Baltimore City or Baltimore County, donate motor vehicles serviced under the Program to low-income families, and employ certain ex-offenders; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Motor Vehicle Repair and Career Certification Program for Ex-Offenders
Senate 3/14/2019 3/15/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page