Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Refund of Civil Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Pipkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the refund, before October 1, 2013, of all civil penalties paid for alleged violations recorded by work zone speed control systems under the Maryland SafeZones Program between June 22, 2010 and March 31, 2012.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page