Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a process for the formation of a specified holding company through the merger of a Maryland parent corporation with or into a specified wholly owned subsidiary of the Maryland parent corporation; providing that a vote of the stockholders of the parent corporation is not necessary to authorize the merger except under specified circumstances; requiring that the merger be approved by a majority of the entire board of directors of the parent corporation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1513
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
(   3-106.2, 8-501.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page