Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employee Autoimmune Disorder Protection Act
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an employer from requiring an employee to work on-site at the employer's workplace if the employee provides documentation from a physician or other licensed health care practitioner that the employee has been diagnosed with an autoimmune disorder or other qualifying illness and that on-site work, or travel to and from the workplace, would be unsafe for the employee and the duties of the employee may reasonably be fulfilled at the home of the employee.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1084
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Employee Autoimmune Disorder Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Employee Autoimmune Disorder Protection Act
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2024 2/17/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2024 2/17/2024 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2024 3/12/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-103,   3-1801 through 3-1805 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page