Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits - Processing and Adjudication of Claims - Restrictions on Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting pharmacy benefits managers and certain purchasers from directly or indirectly charging a contracted pharmacy, or holding a contracted pharmacy responsible for, certain fees; and defining "contracted pharmacy".
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1376
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1162 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Pharmacy Benefits - Processing and Adjudication of Claims - Restrictions on Fees
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-1628.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page