Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Services - Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the motor vehicle registration emergency medical system surcharge to $40.00 per year for certain motor vehicles; altering certain provisions of law related to the Maryland Trauma Physician Services Fund, including provisions related to the contents and sources of the funding, transfer of money from the Fund, and the methodology used to determine eligibility for disbursements from the Fund; increasing the fines for certain violations of the Maryland Vehicle Law related to driving while impaired; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203929/1
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203929/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203929/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Motion Reconsider Favorable Report as Amended (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Motion to Reconsider Committee Amendment (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {203523/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Emergency Services - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-8)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
4/06/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543923/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-16)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Emergency Services - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Registration - Emergency Medical System Surcharge - Increase and Distribution of Funds
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {203929/1 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments {203929/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments {203929/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Motion Reconsider Favorable Report as Amended (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Motion to Reconsider Committee Amendment (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Substitute Committee Amendment {203523/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Emergency Services - Funding
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (37-8) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Appropriations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 4/06/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {543923/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (117-16) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Emergency Services - Funding
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 11:11 AM
Click to return on the top page