Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Superintendent of Schools - Prohibition on Other Employment
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Jennings, Klausmeier, and Salling
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Baltimore County Superintendent of Schools from engaging in other employment; and providing for the application of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {914633/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Baltimore County - Superintendent of Schools - Prohibition on Other Employment
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {914633/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore County - Superintendent of Schools - Prohibition on Other Employment
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
(   4-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page