Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Homeowners Association Act - Payment Plan for Fees or Charges - Written Policy
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified homeowners association to develop a written policy regarding a payment plan for specified fees or charges; requiring the written policy to include any qualifications needed to participate in the payment plan and disclose the terms and conditions of the payment plan; requiring the homeowners association to send by mail or electronic transmission a copy of the written policy to each lot owner within 30 days of the finalization of the written policy; and applying the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Homeowners Association Act - Payment Plan for Fees or Charges - Written Policy
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11B-114.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page