Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Horse Racing - Interstate Compact on Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Entering into the Interstate Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards Compact; providing that the purpose of the Compact is to facilitate joint action to create more uniform and effective breed specific rules on the permitted and prohibited use of drugs and medications for the welfare of the horse; establishing the Interstate Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards Compact Commission to administer the Compact; providing for the composition, voting procedures, operation, and powers and duties of the Commission; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1177
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {727072/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Horse Racing - Interstate Compact on Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {727072/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Horse Racing - Interstate Compact on Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Text - Chapter - Horse Racing - Interstate Compact on Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page