Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary Election
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a candidate for the office of judge of the circuit court who is defeated for the nomination at a primary election in each contest for the office of circuit court judge in which the candidate appears on the ballot from appearing on the ballot at the next succeeding general election for any office; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1382
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-5)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary Election
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary Election
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Judiciary and Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 4/05/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (107-5) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary Election
Subjects
(   5-706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page