Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker and Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to distribute $250,000 of certain abandoned property funds to the Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders Fund, which provides grants to the University of Maryland School of Law, the University of Baltimore School of Law, and the Maryland Volunteer Lawyers Service to operate tax clinics for low-income Maryland residents.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1506
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-11)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Hearing 3/12 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Appropriations 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable with Amendments {263327/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (124-11) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders - Funding
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 6:24 PM
Click to return on the top page