Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Water Commerce Account - Contracts for the Purchase of Environmental Outcomes
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone and Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in entering into a certain contract under the Clean Water Commerce Account for the purchase of a certain environmental outcome, to allow certain nonuniform payment schedules for certain purposes; and authorizing the Department, in order to ensure certain outcomes, to require a minimum final payment and, for a contract award greater than $500,000, additional financial protections, including a letter of credit, insurance instrument, or performance bond.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1266
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873020/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-8)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/30/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Clean Water Commerce Account - Contracts for the Purchase of Environmental Outcomes
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Favorable with Amendments {873020/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Clean Water Commerce Account - Contracts for the Purchase of Environmental Outcomes
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (36-8) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
House 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/30/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 9:10 AM
Click to return on the top page