Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Investigate the Challenges of and Opportunities for Minorities in Business - Report and Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Robinson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the date to December 31, 2018, rather than 2017, by which the Task Force to Investigate the Challenges of and Opportunities for Minority Business is required to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly; and extending the termination date of the Task Force for an additional year to June 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Task Force to Investigate the Challenges of and Opportunities for Minorities in Business - Report and Sunset Extension
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page