Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Video Toll Violation - Hearing Venue
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a hearing on a certain video toll violation to be held in the county in which the offense allegedly was committed or the county in which the person charged with the violation resides, if the person is a resident of the State.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Video Toll Violation - Hearing Venue
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Video Toll Violation - Hearing Venue
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
(   21-1414, 26-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page