Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County District Courthouse – H. Wayne Norman, Jr. Memorial Plaza
Sponsored by
Senators Cassilly, Jennings, Zirkin, Astle, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Reilly, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, Waugh, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Naming a certain plaza of the Mary E.W. Risteau District Courts and Multi-Service Center in Harford County to be the H. Wayne Norman, Jr. Memorial Plaza; providing for certain funding for the implementation of the Act; and requiring a certain administrative officer to add appropriate signage to reflect the naming of the plaza.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County District Courthouse – Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568370/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Harford County District Courthouse – Renaming
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {568370/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Harford County District Courthouse – H. Wayne Norman, Jr. Memorial Plaza
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Referred Judiciary 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Text - Chapter - Harford County District Courthouse – H. Wayne Norman, Jr. Memorial Plaza
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page