Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Legislative Districting Plan of 2022
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission)
Status
Enacted under Article III, Section 5 of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 1
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a plan for legislative districts in accordance with the fourth and fifth sentences of Article III, Section 5 of the Maryland Constitution; and providing that the legislative districting plan presented to the General Assembly by the Governor may not become law in accordance with Article III, Section 5 of the Maryland Constitution.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0002
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Legislative Districting Plan of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {773625/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (14-32)
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/21 (Senator Gallion) Rejected (14-29)
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Legislative Districting Plan of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
4AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 01/27 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {213827/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (42-93)
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/22/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {553821/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (38-98)
Proceedings
7AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-42)
Proceedings
7AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Enacted under Article III, Section 5 of the Maryland Constitution
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 1
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Legislative Districting Plan of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Reapportionment and Redistricting
Text - First - Legislative Districting Plan of 2022
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Reapportionment and Redistricting Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Senate 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Favorable Adopted 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Floor Amendment {773625/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (14-32) 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Motion Special Order until 1/21 (Senator Gallion) Rejected (14-29) 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Second Reading Passed 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Legislative Districting Plan of 2022
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/24/2022 1/19/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 4AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 1/26/2022 1/20/2022 Favorable Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/26/2022 1/20/2022 Motion Special Order until 01/27 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/27/2022 1/21/2022 Floor Amendment {213827/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (42-93) 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/27/2022 1/21/2022 Second Reading Passed 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/27/2022 1/22/2022 Floor Amendment {553821/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (38-98) 7AClick to view Recorded Media
House 1/27/2022 1/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (95-42) 7AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Returned Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 1/27/2022 2/01/2022 Enacted under Article III, Section 5 of the Maryland Constitution
Post Passage 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 1
Text - Chapter - Legislative Districting Plan of 2022
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page