Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Partnership With Taiwan - Reaffirmation
Sponsored by
Senator Brooks
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reaffirming the State of Maryland's commitment to and partnership with Taiwan; and supporting efforts of Taiwan.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0003
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Partnership With Taiwan - Reaffirmation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2023
Legislative Date
2/09/2023
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2023
Legislative Date
2/17/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2023
Legislative Date
2/17/2023
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/14/2023
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Partnership With Taiwan - Reaffirmation
Senate 2/09/2023 2/09/2023 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2023 2/17/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2023 2/17/2023 Hearing 3/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2023 3/02/2023 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2023 3/14/2023 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/13/2023 11:44 AM
Click to return on the top page